CO SB197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the treating physician in workers' compensation cases.
Title
Workers' Compensation Physician
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D] | Rep. Steven Woodrow [D] | Sen. Jessie Danielson [D] |
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D] | Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D] | Rep. Tammy Story [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Postpone Senate Bill 21-197 indefinitely. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.012) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.012) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 21-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely |
2021-05-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |