CO SB197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exception to the requirement that a motor vehicle clear a port of entry for vehicles transporting agricultural commodities.
Title
Agriculture Motor Vehicle Port Of Entry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-197 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |