CO SB197 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Advanced Practice Nurse Prescriptive Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Practice Nurse Prescriptive Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-197 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18SenateGovernor Signed
2015-04-29SenateSent to the Governor
2015-04-28SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2015-03-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E8468619502FF11787257DE100000435/$FILE/197_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/400866B5F47F7C7F87257E06008210D8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F05CA485F0658F2287257E060081FC90
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/25F486157ADE2E2D87257E060081EC8B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9D701C41B0F66A6887257E1B007B6EF9

Bill Comments

feedback