CO SB196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payment of expenses of the legislative department.
Title
Fiscal Year 2021-22 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |