CO SB196 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the late vehicle registration fee.
Title
Repeal Late Vehicle Registration Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-196 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-196 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-196 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |