CO SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enhancements to behavioral health services and policy coordination for children and youth, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Child And Youth Behavioral Health System Enhancements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee on Health & Human Services. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-195 to the Committee on Health & Human Services. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Re-Refer Unamended to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |