CO SB195 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that the money in the healthcare affordability and sustainability fee cash fund be appropriated annually rather than continuously appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthcare Affordability & Sustainability Fee Cash Fund Appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-195 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - : Refer Senate Bill 18-195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-13HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2018-03-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-03-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-195
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_195_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_195_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_195_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_195_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_195_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-03-13t083644z-sb18-195-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-195vote5938c8
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-sb18-195-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-195vote5a1086

Bill Comments

feedback