CO SB194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning maternal health, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Health Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2021-05-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-22SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-194
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_194_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_L.014.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB194_J.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb194_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb194_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0194_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb194_r3.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0194_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59e1399f5b99f699872586b7006b6848-sb21-194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c037ffe0541b68b0872586ce00523b3b-sb21-194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c037ffe0541b68b0872586ce00523b3b-sb21-194-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c037ffe0541b68b0872586ce00523b3b-sb21-194-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-194vote56540a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59e1399f5b99f699872586b7006b6848-sb21-194-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59e1399f5b99f699872586b7006b6848-sb21-194-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59e1399f5b99f699872586b7006b6848-sb21-194-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59e1399f5b99f699872586b7006b6848-sb21-194-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/880bc2f456417b12872586e400073d9b-sb21-194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/86d9bbb488a5877c872586e8004ffe2a-sb21-194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/880bc2f456417b12872586e400073d9b-sb21-194-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/880bc2f456417b12872586e400073d9b-sb21-194-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/880bc2f456417b12872586e400073d9b-sb21-194-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-194vote704ea7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-194vote11cddd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-194vote11de8c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-194vote11bea7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/86d9bbb488a5877c872586e8004ffe2a-sb21-194-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback