CO SB193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the "Colorado Medical Practice Act", and, in connection therewith, continuing the Colorado medical board, eliminating the sixty-day limit on the pro bono license, repealing the requirement that a letter of admonition be sent to licensees by certified mail, and updating language and making technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Continue Colorado Medical Practice Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-193
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_193_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf983f6a6ac9aeaa872583cf006e00b8-sb19-193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf983f6a6ac9aeaa872583cf006e00b8-sb19-193-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/93e5fac2fab8140d872583de007302a2-sb19-193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e37942377fd4953872583e100576deb-sb19-193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-193vote581c8c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8706212ed79608f1872583e9000f2550-sb19-193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0ab924faaae4aea5872583eb004e6df2-sb19-193-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-193vote5ba237
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-193vote72cf2b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-193vote72c25b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8706212ed79608f1872583e9000f2550-sb19-193-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback