CO SB193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional limitations on state agency occupational regulations, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Limit State Agency Occupational Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment I]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-193 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-193 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment I]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-193 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-193 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |