CO SB192 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that a local government that interferes with oil and gas operations compensate persons damaged by the interference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Liable Fracking Ban Oil And Gas Moratorium

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-192 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2018-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-03-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-192
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_192_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_192_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_192_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-03-22t133010z-sb18-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-192vote0da87f
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-192vote0d6b72
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-192vote565094
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-04-18t133424z-sb18-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-04-18t133424z-sb18-192-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback