CO SB192 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning provisions to allow marijuana businesses to operate more efficiently, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Business Efficiency Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-192, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02 Governor Signed
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2017-05-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-05-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-04-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2017-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-04-10SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Finance Lay Over Amended
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-192
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_192_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-08t133637z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-16t101309z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-14t140344z-sb17-192-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-14t140344z-sb17-192-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-14t140344z-sb17-192-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-14t140344z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-16t101309z-sb17-192-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-03-16t101309z-sb17-192-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-04-06t080035z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-04-06t080035z-sb17-192-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#766
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-05-01t133933z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-02t080552z-sb17-192-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-05-01t133933z-sb17-192-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1348
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#1177

Bill Comments

feedback