CO SB192 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Therapeutic Drug Selections For Long-term Care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Therapeutic Drug Selections For Long-term Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-11SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-11SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-22SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-04-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2015-03-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5C1A5B10580C113687257DDA007EA9E6/$FILE/192_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8ED13D0D866BDD6F87257E060083ABEA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/632065DBA8BE213587257E0600839B16
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1B263E13EEBCB5AB87257E29006E773D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1B263E13EEBCB5AB87257E29006E773D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C5358DEF4365D9C587257E29006E6684

Bill Comments

feedback