CO SB191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the removal of residency requirements for student members to serve on the board of trustees for Western Colorado university.
Title
Residency Requirement Western Colorado University Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-191 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-191 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-191 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-191 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |