CO SB191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning defendants' rights related to pretrial bond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prompt Pretrial Liberty And Fairness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.034) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.031 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-191 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-191 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-191, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-191, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 004 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-191, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-191, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-191
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_191_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8a538c61927e2025872583d900696d36-sb19-191-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-8-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1519b4932c52917e872583d10071733b-sb19-191-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8a538c61927e2025872583d900696d36-sb19-191-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1ae653b742ea7b8f872583de00536fed-sb19-191-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote6e4ce9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd378609c26093f2872583e80011736a-sb19-191-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40c4d9d85f90a03f872583ed004ee6ba-sb19-191-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40c4d9d85f90a03f872583ed004ee6ba-sb19-191-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote591360
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote58e9e4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote59023b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote1576bb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-191vote1564b3

Bill Comments

feedback