CO SB191 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FY 2015-16 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Title
FY 2015-16 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-191 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |