CO SB190 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning policies to make punishable deceptive actions regarding pregnancy-related services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deceptive Trade Practice Pregnancy-related Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-190 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Adopt Report (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-190 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-21 Governor Signed
2023-04-11 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-04-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-31HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-03-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-28HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2023-03-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2023-03-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-03-15SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-190
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_190_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/48C8E6A0BF96811487258978007B6F55/SB190_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/0C63FA1A0DEEBC498725897A00058A48/SB190_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/8F28E297458628E687258978008022B5/SB190_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/0AE303B607B0D8AF87258979005C1566/SB190_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/04390A754006BC4F8725897900619C89/SB190_L.009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/9AC9CC9CA7258FBB8725897A0013764E/SB190_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/52DBFF4EEFCFD6D88725897A000F9632/SB190_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/D37B4A1CCA8011D9872589790057488B/SB190_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/DF75FA1B19E2F5D58725897A00187129/SB190_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/948A01DE18E75D90872589820005CBDB/SB190_L.036.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/D67A772744C0534487258982000637F8/SB190_L.038.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/2F0E2FBAC1066E7487258982006EBBF2/SB190_L.045.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/8123F890D596AEC2872589820005A887/SB190_L.035.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/6DBA7B950162BD608725897F0072CC2F/SB190_L.023.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/B10C2844817980A18725898200041C0F/SB190_L.024.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/7F35625D8EBFB9158725898200063719/SB190_L.030.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/AA7583FE5190DB9087258982007E2E8C/SB190_L.049.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb190_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb190_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5a7cded6da16cf13872589730081fa60-sb23-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-190vote1d4a01
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-190vote1b6f60
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-190vote1d34ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-190vote6a7ce3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/70f8c30549d4f234872589800078e827-sb23-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-190vote68904d

Bill Comments

feedback