CO SB189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the funding of Colorado water conservation board projects, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Water Conservation Board Construction Fund Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-189 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |