CO SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of income tax credits for innovative motor vehicles for purchases and leases entered into on or after January 1, 2018.
Title
Repeal Income Tax Credit Innovative Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |