CO SB186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient School & Community Performance Contract
Title
Efficient School & Community Performance Contract
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Schwartz [D] | Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Rep. Max Tyler [D] | Rep. Millie Hamner [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-186 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L. 001 (Attachment ) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L. 001 (Attachment ) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |