CO SB185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protections for minor human trafficking victims, and, in connection therewith, requiring a post-enactment review of the implementation of this act.
Title
Protections For Minor Human Trafficking Victims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |