CO SB184 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

No Detention For Failure To Attend School

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Detention For Failure To Attend School

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2015-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance
2015-02-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184sedu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184seduapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184edu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/35B6F574D250965087257DA20061B2F5/$FILE/184_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/98650140EE959A7987257E0600827CA2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9D4782A8C5E5682E87257E060081B4F0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9C481DB966D59F7987257E060081859F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FD93F58FD10BCAE287257E0B006F9A1C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/44A60F7DD4281CC687257E23004BCD3F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/259E48194AE6808B87257E23004BC9D4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/67F4DAE31132A62687257E38006C2630
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A1E13237249F7F7387257E38006BE18C

Bill Comments

feedback