CO SB182 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority to allocate a portion of the source market fee to statutorily authorized purse funds.
Title
Source Market Fee Allocation To Horse Purse Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-182 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-182 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |