CO SB181 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning state agencies addressing health disparities in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equity Strategic Plan Address Health Disparities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-181 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2021-05-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-05-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-31SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-181
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_181_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB181_J.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb181_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb181_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0181_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb181_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0181_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb1869a46cdcfcd6872586a90078d6e4-sb21-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb1869a46cdcfcd6872586a90078d6e4-sb21-181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb1869a46cdcfcd6872586a90078d6e4-sb21-181-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb1869a46cdcfcd6872586a90078d6e4-sb21-181-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb1869a46cdcfcd6872586a90078d6e4-sb21-181-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3011483462565f80872586c7004f4875-sb21-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3011483462565f80872586c7004f4875-sb21-181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-181vote550f7d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-181vote553148
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d5d83ff873be675c872586d9006d6e31-sb21-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ce435fde1b6bac87872586df00571d23-sb21-181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ce435fde1b6bac87872586df00571d23-sb21-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ce435fde1b6bac87872586df00571d23-sb21-181-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-181vote77cb28
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-181vote71ada9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-181vote71c459

Bill Comments 750

feedback