CO SB180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Senior Dental Program To DHCPF
Title
Transfer Senior Dental Program To DHCPF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.021 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.021 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |