CO SB179 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CDLE Unemployment Insurance Classification
Title
CDLE Unemployment Insurance Classification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-179 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |