CO SB177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning matters related to background checks for persons who have contact with children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background Checks Persons Who Work With Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-177
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_177_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/06062646b8bc219f872583d1006d1fde-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ed5996f3b11f0f93872583de00741204-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a3eaa184a6294f4a872583e100573bde-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/06062646b8bc219f872583d1006d1fde-sb19-177-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote581c84
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8adc7708d51199e2872583eb0074b082-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/04f5b203d674a41f872583ec006d3f4e-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5c9004aae28787b2872583ed004fdaa7-sb19-177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote56f46e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote571fde
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote570d00
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote162dde
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-177vote1615cd

Bill Comments

feedback