CO SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the penalties imposed on the driver of a motor vehicle who causes serious bodily injury to a vulnerable road user, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Serious Bodily Injury Vulnerable Road User Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-175 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-175 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-175 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-175, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2019-04-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-175
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_175_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8137f233c8909409872583c1006f40d8-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af4fa2c50458ecfe872583d1006bcce6-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/720989c97973dc30872583d7006e6a2a-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af4fa2c50458ecfe872583d1006bcce6-sb19-175-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af4fa2c50458ecfe872583d1006bcce6-sb19-175-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/73ea2ada8a1fc6a5872583de004fd737-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/73ea2ada8a1fc6a5872583de004fd737-sb19-175-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-175vote5c59a0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e9d99214023a5b7872583e600744553-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/180bf2c0458017ab872583e900081b99-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9eef25a12110de75872583eb004de293-sb19-175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-175vote5ab005
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-175vote719e7b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-175vote718f1b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-175vote74cca3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e9d99214023a5b7872583e600744553-sb19-175-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback