CO SB175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prohibition against paid union activities by public employees.
Title
Prohibit Paid Union Activity By Public Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |