CO SB174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to behavioral health services for medicaid recipients under twenty-one years of age.
Title
Access To Certain Behavioral Health Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-12 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |