CO SB172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning crimes related to an at-risk person, and, in connection therewith, creating the crimes of unlawful abandonment and unlawful confinement and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect From Unlawful Abandonment And Confinement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-172, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-172, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-172, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-172, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-172, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-04-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-172
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_172_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a95ad26ba4228413872583d1005cec9b-sb19-172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/411f4c963803e48a872583da004dafe4-sb19-172-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/411f4c963803e48a872583da004dafe4-sb19-172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-172vote5acff4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a95ad26ba4228413872583d1005cec9b-sb19-172-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/132a2a40e476ba5e872583e70076490b-sb19-172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/628eda6613ce923e872583ec004db79b-sb19-172-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-172vote58e01c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-172vote14c655
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-172vote14b6b4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/132a2a40e476ba5e872583e70076490b-sb19-172-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback