CO SB171 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the "Uniform Fiduciary Income and Principal Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Fiduciary Income And Principal Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-171 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-171 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17 Governor Signed
2021-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-06HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-171
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_171_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb171_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/98f413a37b741c6b872586a300795236-sb21-171-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-171vote5340f9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bf62bb1c1d5833f2872586cb00730e1e-sb21-171-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-171vote5a6657

Bill Comments 750

feedback