CO SB170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an inquiry into a college applicant's nonacademic conduct prior to admission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inquiry Into College Applicant Criminal History

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-170 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-170 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-02 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-170
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_170_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-170vote8168e8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fbf4024b9df8697d872583d1005c76fd-sb19-170-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-170vote5c35bd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebb55a65498acd87872583de0071a829-sb19-170-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-170vote586342
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fbf4024b9df8697d872583d1005c76fd-sb19-170-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fbf4024b9df8697d872583d1005c76fd-sb19-170-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fbf4024b9df8697d872583d1005c76fd-sb19-170-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fbf4024b9df8697d872583d1005c76fd-sb19-170-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebb55a65498acd87872583de0071a829-sb19-170-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback