CO SB169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning project management competencies for certain state contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Project Management Competencies For Certain Contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-169, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-169 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-169, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-169, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-169
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_169_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e35ca9e234e763c3872583d1006dfac1-sb19-169-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e35ca9e234e763c3872583d1006dfac1-sb19-169-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5d6634d0b3930ee1872583da004d6527-sb19-169-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-169vote5bde4c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-169vote5bca3d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b36e72b92afe29df872583e60073ce99-sb19-169-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b36e72b92afe29df872583e60073ce99-sb19-169-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-169vote57b217
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-169vote708379
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-169vote7078ee

Bill Comments

feedback