CO SB169 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office Of Information Technology Reports To GA
Title
Office Of Information Technology Reports To GA
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Lambert [R] | Rep. Jenise May [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-169 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-169 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-169 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |