CO SB168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning gun violence victims' access to the judicial system.
Title
Gun Violence Victims' Access To Judicial System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Joint - CC_SB23-168_2023A: Accept the First Conference Report (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (2nd) (Y: 19 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.075) (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.029 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Joint - CC_SB23-168_2023A: Accept the First Conference Report (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (2nd) (Y: 19 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.075) (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.029 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-04-11 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-04-06 | First Conference Committee Result was to Corrected Report Amending Rerevised Bill | |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-03-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |