CO SB168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning support for backcountry search and rescue services in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Backcountry Search And Rescue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-168 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 22-168 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |