CO SB168 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning tax policy that promotes environmental sustainability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sustainable Severance & Property Tax Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 20-168 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback