CO SB168 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax policy that promotes environmental sustainability.
Title
Sustainable Severance & Property Tax Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 20-168 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-168, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |