CO SB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning implementation of recommendations of the committee on legal services in connection with legislative review of rules of state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rule Review Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-168 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-168 to the Committee on Legal Services. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Governor Signed
2019-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/29/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/15/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-04HouseHouse Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Legal Services
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-168
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_168_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/378c2b6b41d7e464872583b60052f86d-sb19-168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/378c2b6b41d7e464872583b60052f86d-sb19-168-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-168vote533ac1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/66f16772ba087af2872583c40076ec35-sb19-168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/faea2824684af937872583d2004d5f46-sb19-168-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-168vote57704b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-168vote706245
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-168vote70549a

Bill Comments

feedback