CO SB168 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Health Care Cooperative
Title
Colorado Health Care Cooperative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/06/2011 | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/29/2011 | |
2011-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-18 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/25/2011 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/18/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |