CO SB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a Colorado professional fire fighters license plate, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Colorado Professional Fire Fighters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-167 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-167 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Governor Signed
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-167
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_167_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36a356b0ee4a47e2872583bd006953de-sb19-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e4470d1609849266872583cc004db462-sb19-167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e4470d1609849266872583cc004db462-sb19-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-167vote54a2f7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d8a6fdd1d861539872583dd0070f964-sb19-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b89fedf54ab602a4872583e1004da50e-sb19-167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-167vote584a35

Bill Comments

feedback