CO SB167 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increased enforcement of requirements related to the location of underground facilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Enforce Requirements 811 Locate Underground Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Kerry Donovan [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] | Rep. Lori Saine [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 18-167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |