CO SB164 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the substitution of the word "treasurer's" in place of the word "assessor's" in a statutory provision requiring disclosure of property tax information for purchasers of newly constructed residences within the boundaries of a metropolitan district.
Title
Correction Property Tax Disclosure Information Metropolitan District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |