CO SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of in-home support services within the "Colorado Medical Assistance Act", and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset In-home Support Services Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-164 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |