CO SB159 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor Action - Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor Action - Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distrib Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Rev
Title
Distrib Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Rev
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves to draft the Conference Committee report as amending the reengrossed bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves to draft the Conference Committee report as amending the reengrossed bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves to draft the Conference Committee report as amending the reengrossed bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves to draft the Conference Committee report as amending the reengrossed bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moves to draft the Conference Committee report as amending the reengrossed bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor Action - Became Law | |
2011-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-03-03 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-02-28 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-16 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-15 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2011-02-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |