CO SB158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the "Pet Animal Care and Facilities Act", and, in connection therewith, implementing some of the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Pet Animal Care And Facilities Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-158 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-158
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_158_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d72ae9325ca30d55872583b40075ce39-sb19-158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d72ae9325ca30d55872583b40075ce39-sb19-158-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d72ae9325ca30d55872583b40075ce39-sb19-158-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8722efcfcfc7298872583e10057057d-sb19-158-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8722efcfcfc7298872583e10057057d-sb19-158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-158vote6c0fa2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3e64412c4448d5a0872583e80079a657-sb19-158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9c5aa599c7113808872583eb004dcfd5-sb19-158-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-158vote5b63b8

Bill Comments

feedback