CO SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-16)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-16)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a pilot grant program for the use of nurses in 911 dispatch to help divert incoming 911 calls that do not require emergency medical service to other types of medical care, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Nurse Intake Of 911 Calls Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-24 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |