CO SB156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the state electrical board, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset State Electrical Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-156, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |