CO SB155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Board Of Real Estate Appraisers
Title
Sunset Board Of Real Estate Appraisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee CLSB155.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee CLSB155.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the first report of the first conference committee CLSB155.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reconsider |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Recede |
2013-04-29 | Senate | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-28 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |